 In this mathemagics workbook, I am going to show you simple logic roots of maths tricks. This is the only one of the way of maths tricks and tutorial you will Learn math magic tricks and methods easily. Once you know about math facts You can make your brain faster like a computer and also math magic tricks Amaze Your Friends and Play With maths tricks With Numbers and maths tricks for fast calculation,mathemagicsworkbook.com ## Tuesday, May 7, 2019 MATHS TRICKS

## MATHS TRICKS TOP 20 SHORT CUT MATHS TRICKS FOR MATHS TO MAKE CALCULATION EASY AND FAST

MATHS TRICKS | In this article we will learn about maths tricks of multiplication, division, square numbers.

## maths tricks questions and answers with an example

### MATHS TRICKS MULTIPLICATION OF 11 WITH ANY NUMBER OF 3 DIGITS.

Let me explain MATHS TRICKS rule by taking examples.
1. 352 * 11 = 3 --- (3 + 5) --- (5 + 2) --- 2 = 3872
It means inserting the sum of the 1ST and 2ND digits, then the sum of the 2ND and 3RD  digits between the two terminal digits of the number
2. 213 * 11 = 2 --- (2 + 1) --- (1 + 3) --- 3 = 2343

EXAMPLE.
Here comes an extra case
1) 329 * 11 = 3 --- (3 + 2) +1 --- (2 + 9-10) --- 9 = 3619
It means, if the sum of two digits of the number is greater than 10, then adds 1 to the previous digit and subtracts 10 from the associated digit.
2) 758 * 11 = 7 + 1 --- (7 + 5-10) +1 --- (5 + 8-10) --- 8 = 8338

### MATHS TRICKS REMINDER OF DIVIDING NUMBER by 27 AND 37

Let me explain MATHS TRICKS rule taking examples

Consider the number 34568276; we have to calculate the reminder about diving this number in 27 and 37 respectively.

Make the triplets as written below starting from the units.
34 ......... 568 .......... 276

Now the sum of all the triplets = 34 + 568 + 276 = 878

Divide it by 27 we get reminder like 14
Divide it by 37 we get a reminder as 27

EXAMPLE.
Other examples for the clarification of the MATHS TRICKS rule.
Let the number be 2387850765
The triplets are 2 ... 387 ... 850 ... 765
TOTAL triplets = 2 + 387 + 850 + 765 = 2004
in reviewing the steps we get
2 ...... 004
Sum = 6
Divide it by 27 we get a reminder like 6
Divide it by 37 we get a reminder as

### MATHS TRICKS REMINDER OF DIVIDING THE NUMBER OF 7 11 AND 13

Let me explain this rule of MATHS TRICKS taking examples
Consider the number 34568276, we have to calculate the reminder about diving this number by 7 11 and 13 respectively.
Make the triplets as written below starting from the units.
34 ......... 568 .......... 276
SO alternate sum = 34 + 276 = 310 and 568
And the difference of these sums = 568-310 = 258
Divide it by 7 we get a reminder like 6
Divide it by 11 we get a reminder like 5
Divide it by 13 we get a reminder as 11
Other examples:-
Consider the number 4523895099854
The triplet pairs are 4 ... 523 ... 895 ... 099 ... 854
Alternative sums are 4 + 895 + 854 = 1753 and 523 + 099 = 622
Difference = 1131
Review the same triplication process
1 ...... 131
Then the difference = 131-1 = 130
Divide it by 7 we get a reminder like 4
Divide it by 11 we get a reminder like 9
Divide it by 13 so we get a reminder as 0

#### MATHS TRICKS TO CALCULATE THE REMINDER OF DIVIDING THE NUMBER BY 3

MATHS TRICKS Method: - first calculate the sum of digits, then divide it by 3, the remainder, in this case, will be the required reminder

Example: - 1342568
Let the number be as written above
Its sum of digits = 29 = 11 = 2
Then the remainder will be 2
EXAMPLE.
Take some others
34259677858
The sum of digits of the number is 64 = 10 = 1
Reminder is 1

Similarly, the number is 54670329845
Then the sum of digits = 53 = 8
When we divide 8 by 3 we get a reminder like 2, so the answer will be 2

### MATHS TRICKS PLACE OF NUMBERS NEAR 100

Let me explain this rule by taking examples.
96 ^ 2: -
First calculate 100-96, it's 4
Then 96 ^ 2 = (96-4) ---- 4 ^ 2 = 9216
Similar
106 ^ 2: -
First, calculate 106-100, it's 6
Then 106 ^ 2 = (106 + 6) ---- 6 ^ 2 = 11236
EXAMPLE.
Another case arises.
110 ^ 2 is equal (110 + 10) ---- 100 is equal (120 + 1) ---- 00 = 12100
Similarly
89 ^ 2 is equal (89-11) ---- 121 is equal (78 + 1) ---- 21 =7921

### MATHS TRICKS 2 DIGIT SQUARE NUMBERS

Let me explain this MATHS trick by taking examples.
67 ^ 2 = [6 ^ 2] [7 ^ 2] + 20 * 6 * 7 = 3649 + 840 is equals to 4489
Similarly
25 ^ 2 = [2 ^ 2] [5 ^ 2] + 20 * 2 * 5 = 425 + 200 = 625
Take one more example
97 ^ 2 = [9 ^ 2] [7 ^ 2] + 20 * 9 * 7 = 8149 + 1260 = 9409
Here it is not an operation; it is only a separation between the initial 2 digits and the last 2.
EXAMPLE
Here comes an extra case
Consider the following examples for that
91 ^ 2 = [9 ^ 2] [1 ^ 2] + 20 * 9 * 1 = 8101 + 180 =8281

#### MATHS TRICKS MULTIPLICATION OF 2 NUMBERS OF TWO DIGITS WHERE THE FIRST DIGIT OF BOTH THE NUMBERS ARE EQUAL AND THE LAST DIGIT OF THE TWO NUMBERS IS SUPPLIED TO 10

Let me explain this MATHS TRICKS rule taking examples
To calculate 56 × 54:
Multiply 5 by 5 + 1. Then, 5 * 6 = 30. Write 30.
Multiply the last digits together: 6 * 4 = 24. Write 24.
The product of 56 and 54 is thus 3024.
EXAMPLE.
Understand the rule with 1 more example.
78 * 72 = [7 * (7 + 1)] [8 * 2] = 5616

### MATHS TRICKS MULTIPLICATION OF TWO NUMBERS THAT DIFFER FROM 6

If the two numbers differ by 6, their product is the square of their average minus 9
Let me explain this MATHS TRICKS rule by taking examples.
10 * 16 = 13 ^ 2 - 9 = 160
22 * 28 = 25 ^ 2 - 9 = 616
EXAMPLE. Understand the rule with 1 more example.
997 (*) 1003 = 1000 ^ 2 - 9 is equals to 999991

### MATHS TRICKS MULTIPLYING TWO NUMBERS THAT DIFFER FROM 4

If two numbers differ by four, then their product is the square of the number in the middle (the average of the 2 numbers) minus 4.
Let me explain this MATHS TRICKS rule by taking examples.
22 * 26 = 24 ^ 2 - 4 = 572
98 * 102 = 100 ^ 2 - 4 = 9996
EXAMPLE.
Understand the rule with 1 more example.
148 * 152 = 150 ^ 2 - 4 = 22496

### MATHS TRICKS MULTIPLICATION OF TWO NUMBERS THAT DIFFER FROM 2

(This MATHS TRICKS only works if you have memorized or can quickly calculate the squares of numbers.)
When 2 numbers differ by 2, your product is always the square of the number between these numbers minus 1.
1. I explain this MATHS TRICKS rule taking examples
18 * 20 = 19 ^ 2 - 1 = 361 - 1 = 360
25 * 27 = 26 ^ 2 - 1 = 676 - 1 = 675
EXAMPLE.
Understand the rule with 1 example plus 49 * 51 = 50 ^ 2 - 1 = 2500 - 1 = 2499

### MATHS TRICKS MULTIPLICATION OF 125 WITH ANY NUMBER

Let me explain this MATHS TRICKS rule by taking examples
1. 93 * 125 = 93000/8 = 11625.
2. 137 * 125 = 137000/8 = 17125.
EXAMPLE.
Understand the rule with 1 more example.
3786 * 125 = 3786000/8 = 473250.

### MATHS TRICKS MULTIPLICATION OF 25 WITH ANY NUMBER

Let me explain this rule taking examples
1. 67 * 25 = 6700/4 = 1675.
2. 298 * 25 = 29800/4 = 7450.
EXAMPLE.
Understand the MATHS TRICKS rule with 1 more example.
5923 * 25 = 592300/4 = 148075.

### MATHS TRICKS MULTIPLICATION OF 5 WITH ANY NUMBER

Let me explain this MATHS TRICKS rule by taking examples
1. 49 * 5 = 490/2 = 245.
2. 453 * 5 = 4530/2 = 2265.
EXAMPLE.
Understand the rule with 1 more example.
5649 * 5 = 56490/2 = 28245.

### MATHS TRICKS MULTIPLICATION OF 999 WITH ANY NUMBER

Let me explain this MATHS TRICKS rule by taking examples
1. 51 * 999 = 51 * (1000-1) = 51 * 1000-51 = 51000-51 = 50949.
2. 147 * 999 = 147 * (1000-1) = 147000-147 = 146853.
EXAMPLE.
Understand the rule with 1 more example.
3825 * 999 = 3825 * (1000-1) = 3825000-3825 is equals 3821175

### MATHS TRICKS MULTIPLICATION OF 99 WITH ANY NUMBER

Let me explain this MATHS TRICKS rule by taking examples
1. 46 * 99 = 46 * (100-1) = 46 * 100-46 = 4600-46 = 4554.
2. 362 * 99 = 362 * (100-1) = 36200-362 is equals 35838.
EXAMPLE.
Understand the rule with 1 more example.
2841 * 99 = 2841 * (100-1) = 284100-2841 is equals 281259

### MATHS TRICKS MULTIPLICATION OF 99 WITH ANY NUMBER

Let me explain this MATHS TRICKS rule by taking examples
1. 46 * 99 = 46 * (100-1) = 46 * 100-46 = 4600-46 = 4554.
2. 362 * 99 = 362 * (100-1) = 36200-362 is equals 35838.
EXAMPLE.
Understand the rule with 1 more example.
2841 * 99 = 2841 * (100-1) = 284100-2841 is equals 281259

### MATHS TRICKS MULTIPLICATION OF 9 WITH ANY NUMBER

Let me explain this MATHS TRICKS rule taking examples
1. 18 * 9 = 18 * (10-1) = 18 * 10-18 = 180-18 = 162.
2. 187 * 9 = 187 * (10-1) = 1870-187 = 1683.
EXAMPLE.
Understand the rule with 1 more example.
1864 * 9 = 1864 * (10-1) = 18640-1864 = 16776

### MATHS TRICKS MULTIPLICATION OF 11 WITH ANY NUMBER.

Let me explain this MATHS TRICKS rule by taking examples.
1) 234163 * 11 = 2 --- 2 + 3 --- 3 + 4 --- 4 + 1 --- 1 + 6 --- 6 + 3 --- 3 is equals 2575793
It means inserting the sum of 2 successive digits and placing 2 terminal digits in their place
2) 45345181 * 11 = 4 --- 4 + 5 --- 5 + 3 --- 3 + 4 --- 4 + 5 --- 5 + 1 --- 1 + 8 --- 8 + 1- --1 = 498796991
EXAMPLE.
Here comes an extra case
Consider the following examples for that
3) 473927 * 11 = 4 + 1 --- (4 + 7-10) +1 --- (7 + 3-10) +1 --- (3 + 9-10) +1 --- (9 + 2-10) --- (2 + 7) --- 7 = 5213197
4) 584536 * 11 = 5 + 1 --- (5 + 8-10) +1 --- (8 + 4-10) --- (4 + 5) --- (5 + 3) --- (3 + 6) --- 6 = 6429896

### MATHS TRICKS SQUARE OF ANY NUMBER OF 2 DIGITS

Let me explain this MATHS TRICKS rule by taking examples
27 ^ 2 = (27 + 3) * (27-3) + 3 ^ 2 = 30 * 24 + 9 = 720 + 9 = 729
In this method, we have to do a number that ends with 0, that's why; we add 3 to 27.
EXAMPLE. Understand the rule with 1 more example.
78 ^ 2 = (78 + 2) * (78-2) + 2 ^ 2 = 80 * 76 + 4 = 6080 + 4 = 6084

### MATHS TRICKS  PLACE OF A NUMBER OF 2 DIGITS WITH END OF 5

Let me explain this MATHS TRICKS rule taking examples
35 ^ 2 = 3 * (3 + 1) --- 25 = 1225
EXAMPLE.
Another example
95 ^ 2 = 9 * (9 + 1) --- 25 = 9025

TAGS-
magic maths tricks, maths tricks for fast calculation, maths tricks for competitive exams, maths tricks for fast multiplication, maths tricks pdf, maths tricks for kids, maths tricks in Hindi, maths tricks app